+ − Summary
+ − Actions (17)
On December 6, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Readiness.
- Executive Comment Requested from DOD, DOE.
On August 20, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
On July 16, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Commercial and Administrative Law.
On June 25, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Hazardous Materials, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
On June 14, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On June 13, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Education and the Workforce
- Referred to House Resources
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Armed Services
- Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, Resources, Education and the Workforce, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor