+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On November 27, 1989 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 101-173.
- Signed by President.
On November 15, 1989 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On November 14, 1989 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 13, 1989 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Ackerman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Mr. Ridge demanded a second on the motion to suspend the rules.
- On ordering a second Agreed to without objection.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On November 13, 1989 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote.
On November 13, 1989 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 31, 1989 in the House:
- Referred sequentially to the House Committee on Appropriations for a period not to exceed 15 legislative days.
- Reported to House by the Committee on Post Office and Civil Service. H. Rept.99-325, Part I.
On October 25, 1989 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 24, 1989 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 21, 1989 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from OMB, OPM.
On February 10, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Compensation and Employee Benefits.
On January 3, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor