+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 115-240.
- Signed by President.
On September 5, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On August 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On August 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5869)
On June 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 466.
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On June 13, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5133-5134)
- Mr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2147.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5133-5135)
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 525.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-682.
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Health Discharged.
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 26, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
- Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
- Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Discharged.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor