+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 29, 1988 in the Senate:
- Incorporated in S.1508 .
On December 4, 1987 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
On December 3, 1987 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On December 1, 1987 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 100-463 .
On November 18, 1987 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From USDA.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported .
On November 10, 1987 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 6, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 15, 1987 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On May 8, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On April 28, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
On April 23, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor