+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 19, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 105-97.
On November 10, 1997 in the House:
- Presented to President.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 9, 1997 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On November 9, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On November 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 263.
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Thompson without amendment. Without written report.
On November 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On October 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On October 21, 1997 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. McHugh moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
On October 7, 1997 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 16, 1997 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On July 15, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Postal Service.
On July 9, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform and Oversight.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor