+ − Summary
+ − Actions (13)
On May 16, 1996 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 8 - 5.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 29, 1996 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On December 7, 1995 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On October 2, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
On August 11, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations.
On August 2, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Civil Service.
On July 27, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House House Oversight
- Referred to House Government Reform and Oversight
- Referred to House Economic and Educational Opportunities
- Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Economic and Educational Opportunities, Government Reform and Oversight, and House Oversight, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor