+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 214.
On July 16, 2003 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 421 - 2 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
- POSTPONED ROLL CALL VOTE - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 2122 , as amended, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill, as amended, and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Cox demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of passage until later in the legislative day.
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to a previous order of the House.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with 90 minutes of debate on H.R. 2122 , equally divided and controlled.
- H.AMDT.251 On agreeing to the Hastings amendment Agreed to without objection.
- H.AMDT.251 Amendment in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Hastings . An amendment in the nature of a substitute considered as adopted pursuant to a previous order of the House.
- Considered by previous order of the House.
- Consideration initiated by previous order of the House.
On July 8, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 98.
- Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security . H. Rept. 108-147 , Part III.
On June 27, 2003 in the House:
- House Committee on Homeland Security Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than July 8, 2003.
On June 26, 2003 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 29 - 0.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 13, 2003 in the House:
- House Committee on Homeland Security Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than June 27, 2003.
On June 12, 2003 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Government Reform. H. Rept. 108-147 , Part II.
On June 11, 2003 in the House:
- Committee on Armed Services discharged.
On June 10, 2003 in the House:
- Referred sequentially to the House Committee on Armed Services for a period ending not later than June 11, 2003 pursuant to clause 1, rule X.
- House Committee on Homeland Security Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than June 13, 2003.
- House Committee on Government Reform Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than June 13, 2003.
- Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 108-147 , Part I.
On May 22, 2003 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to House Homeland Security
- Referred to House Government Reform
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Government Reform, and Homeland Security , for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.251
An amendment in the nature of a substitute considered as adopted pursuant to a previous order of the House.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor