+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held.
On August 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
On July 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On July 30, 2007 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- H.AMDT.724 On agreeing to the Natural Resources amendment Agreed to without objection.
- H.AMDT.724 Amendment reported by the House Committee on Natural Resources. Amendment in the nature of a substitute is technical in nature.
- Mrs. Christensen asked unanimous consent discharged from the Committee on the Whole on the State of the Union.
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 110-273 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 175.
On July 18, 2007 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 13, 2007 in the House:
- Committee Hearings Held.
On May 2, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.724
Amendment in the nature of a substitute is technical in nature.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor