+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On August 23, 1993 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received from Peace Corps.
On August 4, 1993 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. H. Rept. 103-214, Part I.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 9, 1993 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Peace Corps.
On June 30, 1993 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Environment and Natural Resources Discharged.
- Subcommittee on Oceanography, Gulf of Mexico, and the Outer Continental Shelf Discharged.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 27, 1993 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from State, Commerce, EPA.
On May 25, 1993 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Policy, Trade and Environment.
On May 19, 1993 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Commerce.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Natural Resources.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Oceanography, Gulf of Mexico, and the Outer Continental Shelf.
On May 12, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor