+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On August 17, 1999 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 106-48.
- Signed by President.
On August 11, 1999 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On August 6, 1999 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On August 5, 1999 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On August 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On August 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 249.
On August 2, 1999 in the House:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 211 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Coble moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On January 19, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, Hazardous Materials and Pipeline Transportation.
On January 7, 1999 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On January 6, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor