+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 6, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Presented to President.
On August 28, 1995 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On August 11, 1995 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 180.
On August 10, 1995 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Roth without amendment. Without written report.
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
- Subcommittee on Oversight of Government Management. Hearings held.
On August 9, 1995 in the Senate:
On August 7, 1995 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On August 4, 1995 in the House:
- Mr. Davis asked unanimous consent to consider.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On August 2, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 119.
- Reported by the Committee on Government Reform. H. Rept. 104-227 .
On August 1, 1995 in the House:
- Mr. Clinger asked unanimous consent that the Committee on Government Operations have until midnight on Aug. 1 to file a report on H.R. 2108 . Agreed to without objection.
On July 27, 1995 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 26, 1995 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 5 - 0.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on District of Columbia.
On July 25, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform and Oversight.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor