+ − Summary
+ − Actions (14)
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
On August 25, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement.
On August 2, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Middle East and South Asia .
On July 29, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on International Monetary Policy and Trade.
On June 28, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
On June 20, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology, Information Policy, Intergovernmental Relations and Procurement Reform .
On June 3, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Ways and Means, Financial Services, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Foreign Affairs
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Financial Services
- Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
+ − Sponsors (68)
Type:
Primary Sponsor