+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On December 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On December 14, 2011 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 418 - 2 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
On December 13, 2011 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2105 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Ms. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On November 2, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade Discharged.
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On August 25, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement.
On August 2, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade.
On July 29, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on International Monetary Policy and Trade.
On June 20, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology, Information Policy, Intergovernmental Relations and Procurement Reform .
On June 17, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Space and Aeronautics.
On June 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
On June 6, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
On June 3, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to House Financial Services
- Referred to House Science, Space, and Technology
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
- Referred to House Foreign Affairs
- Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Government Reform, the Judiciary, Ways and Means, Science, Space, and Technology, Financial Services, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor