+ − Summary
+ − Actions (12)
On August 28, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
- Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
On July 22, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations.
On July 10, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads.
On July 7, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Civil Service.
On July 1, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
On June 26, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to House Government Reform and Oversight
- Referred to House National Security
- Referred to House Education and the Workforce
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, National Security, Government Reform and Oversight, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor