+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On September 26, 1996 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 415 - 6 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
On September 25, 1996 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed until Sept. 26.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Barr moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On September 24, 1996 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 104-827 , Part I.
On September 18, 1996 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On September 11, 1996 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 21, 1996 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On August 4, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations.
On July 28, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime.
On July 21, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Economic and Educational Opportunities
- Referred to the Committee on Economic and Educational Opportunities, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor