+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On October 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
On October 6, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6801)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2091.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6801-6802)
- Mr. Neugebauer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 214.
- Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-282.
On July 29, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 56 - 2.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 28, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
- Introduced in House