+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On October 20, 1988 in the Senate:
- For Further Action See S.2751 .
On March 22, 1988 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 100-697.
On March 21, 1988 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks. Hearings held.
On March 2, 1988 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Agriculture Department, OMB.
On October 15, 1987 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On October 13, 1987 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 100-369 .
On October 9, 1987 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From USDA.
- Executive Comment Received From Interior.
On September 23, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
On September 21, 1987 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 16, 1987 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 9, 1987 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 1, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 30, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 15, 1987 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On May 8, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On April 16, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
On April 9, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor