+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On September 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 806.
On September 13, 2000 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
On September 12, 2000 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 390 - 8 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2090 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Saxton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On September 6, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 471.
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 106-810 .
On July 26, 2000 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 23, 2000 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 27, 1999 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 17, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Department of Commerce for comments.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans.
On June 9, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor