+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (33)
On November 1, 2000 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 106-404.
- Signed by President.
On October 24, 2000 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 17, 2000 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion.
On October 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Mr. Sensenbrenner moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment.
On October 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 5, 2000 in the Senate:
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.4300 Amendment SA 4300 proposed by Senator Mack for Senator Edwards. To establish a technology partnerships ombudsman.
- S.AMDT.4300 Amendment SA 4300 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
On September 29, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On May 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On May 11, 1999 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Sensenbrenner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 209 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
On May 6, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 70.
- Committee on Judiciary discharged.
- House Committee on Judiciary Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than May 6, 1999.
- Reported by the Committee on Science. H. Rept. 106-129 , Part I.
On March 25, 1999 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Technology Discharged.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts and Intellectual Property.
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology.
On January 6, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Science
- Referred to the Committee on Science, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.4300
To establish a technology partnerships ombudsman.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor