+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (22)
On August 6, 2021 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 117-33.
- Signed by President.
On August 4, 2021 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On July 28, 2021 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On July 27, 2021 in the Senate:
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 36.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. Without written report.
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 208.
- Mr. Mfume moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H556-557)
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 15 (Roll no. 32). (text: CR H556)
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H563-564)
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 406 - 15 (Roll no. 32).(text: CR H556)
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On January 5, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
- Introduced in House