+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 112-109.
- Signed by President.
On May 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On April 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On April 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On April 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 373.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security.
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 418 - 2 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2079 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Kelly moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On November 3, 2011 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy Discharged.
On June 20, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy .
On June 1, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor