+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (31)
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 112-265.
On January 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On January 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On December 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Mr. Gowdy moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 2076 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Scott objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
On December 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- S.AMDT.3342 Amendment SA 3342 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Whitehouse. In the nature of a substitute.
- S.AMDT.3342 Amendment SA 3342 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On November 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
- Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 236.
On September 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
On September 12, 2011 in the House:
- Mr. Gowdy moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2076 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 358 - 9 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On July 29, 2011 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-186 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 121.
On July 20, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On July 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
On June 1, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.3342
In the nature of a substitute.