+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (45)
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- On agreeing to the Scott (VA) amendments (A002) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 192 (Roll no. 178).
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A003) pursuant to the rule.
- Amendments en bloc (A003) offered by Mr. Scott (VA). (consideration: CR H3062-3064, H3065-3066; text: CR H3062)
- House amendment offered/reported by: Amendments en bloc (A003) offered by Mr. Scott (VA).(consideration: CR H3062-3064, H3065-3066; text: CR H3062)
- House amendment not agreed to: On agreeing to the Scott (VA) amendments (A003) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 182 - 243 (Roll no. 179).
- Amendment failed by House: On agreeing to the Scott (VA) amendments (A003) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 182 - 243 (Roll no. 179).
- Roll call votes on amendments in House
- The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A002) pursuant to the rule.
- Amendment agreed to by House: On agreeing to the Davis, Rodney amendment (A004) Agreed to by voice vote.
- Amendments en bloc (A002) offered by Mr. Scott (VA). (consideration: CR H3060-3062, H3065; text: CR H3060)
- House amendment offered/reported by: Amendments en bloc (A002) offered by Mr. Scott (VA).(consideration: CR H3060-3062, H3065; text: CR H3060)
- Amendment agreed to by House: On agreeing to the Scott (VA) amendments (A002) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 192 (Roll no. 178).
- House amendment agreed to: On agreeing to the Scott (VA) amendments (A002) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 192 (Roll no. 178).
- On agreeing to the Rules amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
- Amendment in the nature of a substitute reported by the House Committee on Rules.
- House amendment agreed to: On agreeing to the Rules amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
- House amendment agreed to: On agreeing to the Davis, Rodney amendment (A004) Agreed to by voice vote.
- On agreeing to the Scott (VA) amendments (A003) Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 182 - 243 (Roll no. 179).
- House amendment offered
- DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res 486, the House proceeded with 20 minutes of debate on the Scott (VA) amendment en bloc No. 2.
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 247 - 178 (Roll no. 180).
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 247 - 178 (Roll no. 180).
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table. Agreed to without objection.
- UNFINISHED BUSINESS - The Chair announced that the unfinished business was the question on the Scott amendment en bloc No. 1 which had been debated earlier and on which further proceedings had been postponed.
- House amendment offered/reported by: Amendment (A004) offered by Mr. Davis, Rodney.(consideration: CR H3064-3065; text: CR H3064)
- POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Scott (VA) amendment en bloc No. 2, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mrs. Foxx demanded the yeas and nays an d the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
- DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res 486, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Davis (IL) amendment.
- POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Scott (VA) amendment en bloc No. 1, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mrs. Foxx demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
- DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res 486, the House proceeded with 20 minutes of debate on the Scott (VA) amendment en bloc No. 1.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 2062.
- The resolution provides for 1 hour of debate, orders the previous question, and allows a motion to recommit for each measure. Provides that H. Res. 485 is adopted. Provides that anytime through the legislative day of June 25, 2021, the Speaker may entertain motions offered by the Majority Leader or his designee that the House suspend the rules with respect to multiple measures that were the object of motions to suspend the rules on the legislative days of June 22 or 23, and on which the yeas and nays were ordered and further proceedings postponed.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 486. (consideration: CR H3052-3067; text: CR H3052-3053)
- On agreeing to the Davis, Rodney amendment (A004) Agreed to by voice vote.
- The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A004) pursuant to the rule.
- Amendment (A004) offered by Mr. Davis, Rodney. (consideration: CR H3064-3065; text: CR H3064)
On June 22, 2021 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 486 Reported to House. The resolution provides for 1 hour of debate, orders the previous question, and allows a motion to recommit for each measure. Provides that H. Res. 485 is adopted. Provides that anytime through the legislative day of June 25, 2021, the Speaker may entertain motions offered by the Majority Leader or his designee that the House suspend the rules with respect to multiple measures that were the object of motions to suspend the rules on the legislative days of June 22 or 23, and on which the yeas and nays were ordered and further proceedings postponed.
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 44.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and Labor. H. Rept. 117-63.
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 29 - 18.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (5)
H.Amdt.57
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
H.Amdt.58
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
H.Amdt.59
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
All Actions
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
H.Amdt.60
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
+ − Sponsors (111)
Type:
Primary Sponsor