+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 20, 2018 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 115-198.
- Signed by President.
On July 10, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On June 27, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H5787-5788)
- Ms. Ros-Lehtinen asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H5787-5788)
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2396)
- S.Amdt.2240 Amendment SA 2240 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Rubio. (consideration: CR S2396) In the nature of a substitute.
- Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.2240 Amendment SA 2240 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
On September 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On September 25, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 0 (Roll no. 531). (text: CR H7441-7442)
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7473-7474)
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2061.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7441-7444)
- Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On July 27, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Amendments (2)
SA 2240
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
S.Amdt.2240
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor