+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (32)
On January 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 112-88.
On December 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On December 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On December 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Mr. Westmoreland moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on agreeing to the Senate amendments to H.R. 2056 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Westmoreland objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
On November 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.1127 Referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
- Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- S.AMDT.1221 Amendment SA 1221 proposed by Senator Levin. To clarify the types of losses to be studied, to require appearances before Congress, and for other purposes.
- S.AMDT.1221 Amendment SA 1221 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.
On July 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
On July 28, 2011 in the House:
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On July 26, 2011 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 112-182 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 120.
- Mr. Westmoreland moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2056 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Westmoreland objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
On July 20, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Discharged.
On July 19, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit.
On July 8, 2011 in the House:
- Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral.
On May 31, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
+ − Amendments (2)
S.AMDT.1221
To clarify the types of losses to be studied, to require appearances before Congress, and for other purposes.
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor