+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On October 20, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 28, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 26, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 30, 1983 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From OMB.
On April 15, 1983 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From CAB.
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From CAB.
On March 24, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Aviation.
On March 16, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from DOT, CAB, OMB.
On March 10, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor