+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
On May 23, 2005 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2046 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Boozman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On May 19, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 45.
- Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 109-88 .
On May 11, 2005 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Provisions of H.R. 1292 Incorporated in This Measure, Section 4.
On May 5, 2005 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 4, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
On May 3, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor