+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On November 18, 1987 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From USDA.
On November 10, 1987 in the House:
- For Further Action See H.R.2142 .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 6, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 15, 1987 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On May 8, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On April 14, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
On April 9, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor