+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On June 17, 1994 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On February 23, 1994 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 24, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on International Law, Immigration, and Refugees.
On May 18, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on International Security, International Organizations and Human Rights.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on International Operations.
On May 6, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor