+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On June 6, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
On May 23, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
On May 19, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Security, Infrastructure Protection, and Cybersecurity.
On May 3, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On May 2, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Homeland Security
- Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Transportation and Infrastructure, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor