+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On October 11, 1996 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Oct. 31, 1996.
- Committee on International Relations discharged.
- House Committee on International Relations Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Oct. 11, 1996.
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 104-867 , Part I.
On September 28, 1996 in the House:
- Mr. Gilchrest asked unanimous consent that the Committee on Resources have until 5:00 p.m. on Oct. 11 to file a report on H.R. 2041 . Agreed to without objection.
On September 18, 1996 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee on Native American and Insular Affairs Discharged.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On August 2, 1996 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On September 12, 1995 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On August 5, 1995 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On July 28, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims.
On July 18, 1995 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Interior, State.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Native American and Insular Affairs.
On July 13, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House International Relations
- Referred to House Resources
- Referred to the Committee on Resources, and in addition to the Committees on International Relations, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Robert A. Underwood
Type:
Primary Sponsor