+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 15, 1985 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 99-118 .
On May 8, 1985 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 22, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Fossil and Synthetic Fuels.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Energy Conservation and Power.
On April 17, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Transportation, Aviation and Materials.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Energy Research and Production.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Natural Resources, Agricultural Research, and Environment.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Energy Development and Applications.
On April 16, 1985 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Energy and the Environment.
On April 15, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Science and Technology.
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor