+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On October 28, 1986 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 99-571.
- Signed by President.
On October 16, 1986 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 15, 1986 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 9, 1986 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 9, 1986 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to the House amendment to the Senate amendment. By Voice Vote.
On October 7, 1986 in the Senate:
- Message on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendments to Senate amendments.
On October 6, 1986 in the Senate:
- House Concurred, in Senate Amendments , with Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
On September 16, 1986 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
- Senate struck all after the Enacting Clause and substituted the language of S. 1416 amended.
- Senate Committee on Banking discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On September 18, 1985 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking.
On September 17, 1985 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On September 9, 1985 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 161.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Energy and Commerce. Report No: 99-258.
On July 31, 1985 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 25, 1985 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 26, 1985 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 20, 1985 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 11, 1985 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 22, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Consumer Protection and Finance.
On April 15, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor