+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On October 14, 2011 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-248 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 164.
On July 20, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
On June 3, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 2, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
On May 26, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor