+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On August 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 544.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman without amendment. With written report No. 111-274 .
On June 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On June 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On June 9, 2010 in the House:
- Mr. Inslee asked unanimous consent that, in the engrossment of the bill, H.R. 2008 , the Clerk be directed to carry out the modification submittted at the desk which adds a section 8 to the text of the bill. Agreed to without objection.
On June 8, 2010 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mrs. Napolitano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2008 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On October 21, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 174.
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 111-308 .
On September 10, 2009 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Water and Power Discharged.
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor