+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On February 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
On February 2, 2000 in the House:
- DEBATE - The Committee is debating the amendment offered by Mr. Chabot.
- Rule H. Res. 412 passed House.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 412 .
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2005 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. After general debate, the bill shall be considered for amendment under the five-minute rule. It shall be in order to consider as an original bill, for the purpose of amendment, the amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on the Judiciary now printed in the bill. Measure will be considered read. No amendment shall be in order except for those printed in the portion of the Congressional Record designated for that purpose.
- House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 412 and Rule XXIII.
- The Speaker designated the Honorable Steven C. LaTourette to act as Chairman of the Committee.
- The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 2005 .
- H.AMDT.569 Amendment offered by Mr. Chabot. Amendment clarifies that the eighteen year statute of repose for durable goods applies to the date when the accident occurs and not to the date of the filing of the claim; and clarifies that the bill does not affect any relief for remediation of the environment.
- H.AMDT.569 Chabot amendment modified by unanimous consent. The modification made technical changes to the amendment.
- GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 2005 .
- H.AMDT.569 On agreeing to the Chabot amendment as modified Agreed to by voice vote.
- H.AMDT.570 Amendment offered by Mr. Terry. Amendment no. 4 printed in the Congressional Record to exempt durable goods that were not state-of-the-art at the time they were produced.
- DEBATE - The Committee is debating the amendment offered by Mr. Terry.
- H.AMDT.570 By unanimous consent, the Terry amendment was withdrawn.
- The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 2005 .
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- The House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union.
- On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 222 - 194 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On February 1, 2000 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 412 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2005 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. After general debate, the bill shall be considered for amendment under the five-minute rule. It shall be in order to consider as an original bill, for the purpose of amendment, the amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on the Judiciary now printed in the bill. Measure will be considered read. No amendment shall be in order except for those printed in the portion of the Congressional Record designated for that purpose.
On October 22, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 236.
- Committee on Commerce discharged.
On October 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred sequentially to the House Committee on Commerce for a period ending not later than Oct. 22, 1999 for consideration of such provisions of the bill and amendment as fall within the jurisdiction of that committee pursuant to clause 1, rule X.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 106-410 , Part I.
On September 22, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 16 - 14.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 21, 1999 in the House:
- Committee Hearings Held.
On June 7, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Amendments (2)
H.AMDT.569
Amendment clarifies that the eighteen year statute of repose for durable goods applies to the date when the accident occurs and not to the date of the filing of the claim; and clarifies that the bill does not affect any relief for remediation of the environment.
H.AMDT.570
Amendment no. 4 printed in the Congressional Record to exempt durable goods that were not state-of-the-art at the time they were produced.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor