+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2009 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 111-102.
- Signed by President.
On November 20, 2009 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 10, 2009 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 9, 2009 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On November 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On November 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 201.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On September 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On September 8, 2009 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2004 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Ms. Watson moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On June 18, 2009 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor