+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 404 - 3 (Roll no. 62). (text: CR 2/5/2018 H757-758)
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H966-967)
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Royce (CA) objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1997.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H757-760)
- Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On December 14, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe, Eurasia, and Emerging Threats.
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor