+ − Summary
+ − Actions (22)
On December 23, 1987 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-205.
- Signed by President.
On December 18, 1987 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On December 16, 1987 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On December 14, 1987 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 12, 1987 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On December 12, 1987 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On August 4, 1987 in the Senate:
- Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 286.
On June 30, 1987 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
On June 29, 1987 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On June 25, 1987 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 109.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 100-187.
On June 24, 1987 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 23, 1987 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From Interior.
On June 16, 1987 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 11, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 15, 1987 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Interior.
On May 8, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On April 8, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor