+ − Summary
+ − Actions (17)
On July 25, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Select Education.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Education Reform.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on 21st Century Competitiveness.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations.
On June 25, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
On June 22, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition and Forestry.
On June 21, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
On May 24, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to House Financial Services
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Agriculture
- Referred to House Education and the Workforce
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Education and the Workforce, Agriculture, the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor