+ − Summary
+ − Actions (8)
On August 1, 1985 in the House:
- Clean Bill H.R.3166 Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in Lieu.
On July 23, 1985 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 17, 1985 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 25, 1985 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 20, 1985 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 18, 1985 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 5, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade.
On April 4, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor