+ − Summary
+ − Actions (11)
On August 2, 1994 in the House:
- See H.R.3600 .
On June 3, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and Competitiveness.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
On May 27, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Labor-Management Relations.
On May 17, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On May 13, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic and Commercial Law.
On May 5, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
On May 4, 1993 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor