+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 3, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 104-150.
On May 23, 1996 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On May 22, 1996 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On May 21, 1996 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On May 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Commerce discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On April 24, 1996 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On April 23, 1996 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate.
- Mr. Saxton asked unanimous consent that, during the consideration of the bill H.R. 1965 under suspension of the rules, the time for debate be extended to not to exceed one hour. Agreed to without objection.
- Mr. Saxton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Saxton objected to the Yea - Nay vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: ; 407 - 0 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On April 16, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 254.
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 104-521 .
On March 13, 1996 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 18, 1995 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 12, 1995 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On September 8, 1995 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received from Commerce.
On July 6, 1995 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Commerce.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife and Oceans.
On June 29, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor