+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On June 23, 1983 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 8, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From Commerce.
On June 7, 1983 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 19, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From ITC.
On May 5, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 27, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 23, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from State, Treasury, Commerce, ITC, USTR.
On March 14, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Trade.
On March 7, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor