+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (32)
On December 17, 1993 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 103-197.
- Signed by President.
On December 8, 1993 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 26, 1993 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 22, 1993 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On November 22, 1993 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to the House amendment to the Senate amendment by Voice Vote.
- Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate amendment.
On November 21, 1993 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House agree with an amendment to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.
- Mr. Vento asked unanimous consent that the House agree with an amendment to the Senate amendment.
On July 22, 1993 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On July 21, 1993 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
On July 16, 1993 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 143.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 103-98.
On June 30, 1993 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported in lieu of S. 971 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On June 23, 1993 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
On June 22, 1993 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On June 21, 1993 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Vento moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 80.
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 103-145.
On June 16, 1993 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- See Subcommittee Action Prior to Referral.
On June 15, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
On June 10, 1993 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Held by the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands; Forwarded by the Subcommittee to the Full Committee Prior to Referral .
On May 27, 1993 in the House:
- Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Prior to Referral .
On April 29, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsors (29)
Robert A. Underwood
Type:
Primary Sponsor