+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 21, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 115-85. (TXT | PDF)
On November 9, 2017 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7121)
On October 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 250.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 115-176.
On July 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4266)
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4266-4267)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 194.
- Mr. Russell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 37.
- Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-66.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor