+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On September 27, 1999 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1934 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Saxton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On July 20, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 139.
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 106-242 .
On June 30, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 22, 1999 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 10, 1999 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 7, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans.
On May 25, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor