+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On October 18, 2011 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-255 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 171.
On July 14, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 17 - 14.
On June 20, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement Discharged.
On May 24, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement.
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor