+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (19)
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 115-104. (TXT | PDF)
- Signed by President.
On December 27, 2017 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8267-8269)
On July 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On July 26, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6330)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1927.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6330-6331)
- Mr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On July 24, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 173.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-241.
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (71)
Type:
Primary Sponsor