+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On January 1, 2021 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 31, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.
- Mrs. Dingell asked unanimous consent to take the bill, H.R. 1923, from the Speaker's Table and agree to the Senate amendment.
On December 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.2717 Amendment SA 2717 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.2717 Amendment SA 2717 proposed by Senator Braun for Senator Cortez Masto. (consideration: CR S7643; text: CR S7643) To improve the bill.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7643)
- Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On September 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
On September 22, 2020 in the House:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H4707-4708)
- H.Amdt.885 On agreeing to the Cleaver amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
- H.Amdt.885 Amendment (A001) in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Cleaver. (consideration: CR H4707-4709; text: CR H4707-4708)
- Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H4705-4709)
- Committee on Financial Services discharged.
- Mr. Cleaver asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (4)
SA 2717
To improve the bill.
S.Amdt.2717
To improve the bill.
All Actions
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
H.Amdt.885
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
+ − Sponsors (166)
Type:
Primary Sponsor